Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 05/28/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/29/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 07/01/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/13/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/13/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/14/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/14/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/21/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/22/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/26/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/29/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 09/08/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/08/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/23/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/29/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 10/18/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/22/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 11/22/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/17/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 04/19/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 05/05/1994
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/10/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/10/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/16/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 05/16/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/18/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/19/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/24/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/14/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/27/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/28/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/30/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/30/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/04/1994