Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 01/21/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 01/26/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/26/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 01/27/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/02/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/16/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 02/16/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/24/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 02/24/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 03/09/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/09/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/18/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 04/21/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 04/28/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 05/04/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 05/06/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/25/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/07/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/15/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/16/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/23/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 06/29/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/30/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/13/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 10/15/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew