Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 06/15/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 06/15/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/01/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 07/01/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/01/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/01/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/01/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 07/01/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/01/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/01/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/01/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/01/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/01/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/14/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 07/14/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/21/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/21/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/21/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/21/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/21/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/21/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/28/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/28/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/28/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/28/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/28/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/28/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 08/02/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 08/02/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 08/02/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 08/02/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 08/02/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/02/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 08/06/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 08/06/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/06/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 08/06/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 09/07/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/07/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 09/07/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/07/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/07/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 09/07/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 09/07/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 09/07/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/07/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/07/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/07/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/07/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/07/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 09/07/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 09/08/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 09/15/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 09/15/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 09/15/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/15/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 09/15/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/15/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/20/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/20/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/20/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/20/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/21/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/21/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/21/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/21/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/29/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/29/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/14/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 10/14/1993