Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/24/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 06/24/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 06/24/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/29/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/29/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/29/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/29/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/29/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/01/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/01/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/01/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/01/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/01/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 07/01/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/01/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/15/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/15/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/22/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 09/22/1993