Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/26/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/02/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 11/02/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 11/02/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 11/19/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/19/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 11/19/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 11/19/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/20/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 01/27/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/02/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/22/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/22/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/02/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/11/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 04/12/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/14/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/20/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/20/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 05/09/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 05/09/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/16/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/16/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 05/23/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/23/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/23/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 06/07/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/07/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/21/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/11/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/19/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/28/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 08/03/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 08/03/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 08/03/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/10/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 08/19/1994
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/14/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 09/14/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/14/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/14/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 09/23/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 10/03/1994