Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 07/22/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 07/22/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/22/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/26/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/30/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 07/30/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/30/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/30/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/30/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 07/30/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 07/30/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/30/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 07/30/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/30/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/30/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 08/04/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 08/04/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 08/04/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/04/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 08/04/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 08/04/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 08/04/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 08/06/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 08/06/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 09/07/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/07/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 09/07/1993