Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/27/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 07/27/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 07/27/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 07/27/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/05/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 10/05/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 10/05/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/05/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/29/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 10/29/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/29/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 11/10/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/10/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 11/10/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 11/19/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 11/19/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 01/25/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/26/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/03/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/10/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 03/17/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 04/20/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/04/1994
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/04/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 05/19/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/23/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 05/24/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/08/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 06/08/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 06/23/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/23/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/22/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 07/29/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 08/11/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 08/19/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 08/25/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 09/14/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/27/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 09/27/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/28/1994
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/28/1994
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 09/28/1994
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/29/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/29/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 09/30/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/05/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 10/05/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 10/05/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 10/05/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/06/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 10/06/1994