Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 09/08/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/05/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 10/06/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 10/13/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/18/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 10/19/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 10/27/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/01/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/03/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 11/03/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 11/04/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/10/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 05/19/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 06/15/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/24/1994