Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 09/14/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 09/14/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 09/15/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 09/22/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/05/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 10/06/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/20/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/03/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 11/18/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 11/19/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 11/19/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 11/19/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 11/23/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/25/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 01/25/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 01/25/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 01/27/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/31/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 02/08/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/09/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 02/22/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 02/24/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/02/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/08/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/15/1994