Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 09/21/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA]* 09/21/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 09/21/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS]* 09/21/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 09/21/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 09/21/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 09/21/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 09/21/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 09/21/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 09/21/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 09/27/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 09/27/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 10/15/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/20/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 10/20/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/26/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 11/16/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 01/27/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 03/01/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 05/18/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/01/1994