Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/27/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/28/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/02/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/04/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 02/17/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/03/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/03/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/30/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/28/1993