Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 10/06/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN]* 10/06/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 10/06/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 10/06/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 10/06/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 11/19/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/19/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 11/19/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/19/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 11/19/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 11/22/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 11/23/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 11/23/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 01/25/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/10/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 05/10/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 05/10/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/18/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/25/1994