Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 10/13/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 10/13/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 10/13/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/25/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 03/25/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/25/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/25/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/25/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/25/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/25/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/25/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 03/25/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/25/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 03/25/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/25/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 03/25/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 03/25/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/25/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/25/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/14/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/19/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 05/24/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 06/14/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/14/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/14/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 06/23/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 06/30/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/30/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/12/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/15/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/15/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/21/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/21/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/21/1994