Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 11/17/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/17/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 01/26/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 01/26/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/03/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/03/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/03/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/10/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/10/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 02/10/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 02/10/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 02/24/1994
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/24/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/24/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/24/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/24/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/24/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/24/1994
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 02/24/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 02/24/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 02/24/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/24/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 02/24/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 02/24/1994
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/24/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/24/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/24/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/24/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/24/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/24/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/24/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 02/24/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 02/24/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 02/24/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/24/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/24/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/24/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/24/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/24/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/24/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 02/24/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/24/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/01/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/10/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/16/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/16/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/23/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/12/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 04/12/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/14/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/19/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/26/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 05/03/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/12/1994
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/19/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/07/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/10/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/15/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 06/20/1994
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 06/22/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/22/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/27/1994