There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Hazard Mitigation and Relocation Assistance Act of 1993

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Hazard Mitigation and Relocation Assistance Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve hazard mitigation and relocation assistance in connection with flooding, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/03/1993Became Public Law No: 103-181.
12/03/1993Signed by President.
11/23/1993Presented to President.
11/20/1993Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(consideration: CR 11/19/93 S16585-16586)
11/20/1993Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR 11/20/1993 S16586)
11/20/1993Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/18/1993Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
12/03/1993Became Public Law No: 103-181.
12/03/1993Signed by President.
11/23/1993SenatePresented to President.
11/20/1993SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/20/1993-12:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/20/1993-12:22pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (consideration: CR 11/19/93 S16585-16586)
11/20/1993-12:17pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10329-10330)
11/20/1993-12:17pmHouseMr. Applegate asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
11/20/1993-10:00amHouseReceived in the House.
11/20/1993SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR 11/20/1993 S16586)
11/20/1993SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/18/1993SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO]* 11/18/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 11/18/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 11/18/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 11/18/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/19/1993

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works11/18/1993 Referred to
11/20/1993 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1670. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (11/18/1993)

Hazard Mitigation and Relocation Assistance Act of 1993 - Amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to: (1) increase from 50 to 75 percent of the cost of hazard mitigation measures the amount authorized to be contributed by the President when determined to be cost-effective while substantially reducing the damage or loss suffered in a major disaster; (2) increase the total Federal contributions authorized for damages from a major disaster to 15 percent of the estimated aggregate amounts of grants to be provided under such Act for such disaster; and (3) provide the terms and conditions under which the Director of the Federal Emergency Management Agency may provide property acquisition and relocation assistance in connection with flood damaged property.

States that the purchase of any real property under a qualified buyout program (the federally assisted purchase of property damaged by the major Midwest flood of 1993) shall not constitute the making of Federal financial assistance available for the cost of a program resulting in the acquisition of real property or in an owner of real property being a displaced person within the meaning of the Uniform Relocation Assistance and Real Property Acquisition Policies Act of 1970.