Committees: S.171 — 103rd Congress (1993-1994)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Governmental Affairs01/21/1993 Referred to
02/18/1993 Hearings by
03/24/1993 Markup by
03/31/1993 Reported by S.Rept 103-38
Senate Environment and Public Works03/31/1993 Referred to
04/01/1993 Hearings by
04/15/1993 Reported by S.Rept 103-39