Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 11/19/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 11/20/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 11/20/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 11/20/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/20/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 11/22/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/22/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 11/22/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 11/23/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 11/23/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 11/23/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 11/23/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/23/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 11/23/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 11/23/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/23/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 11/23/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/23/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 11/24/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 11/24/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 01/26/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 01/26/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 01/26/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 01/26/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 01/26/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 01/26/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 01/26/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 01/26/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 01/26/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 01/26/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 01/26/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 01/26/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 01/26/1994
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 01/26/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 01/26/1994
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 01/26/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 01/26/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 02/02/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/02/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/02/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/02/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/02/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/10/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 02/24/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/01/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/10/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/16/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 04/19/1994