There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 23, United States Code, to permit the use of funds under the highway bridge replacement and rehabilitation program for seismic retrofit of bridges, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
03/17/1994Became Public Law No: 103-220.
03/17/1994Signed by President.
03/08/1994Presented to President.
03/02/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
02/07/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S1091)
02/04/1994Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Baucus without amendment. Without written report.
01/25/1994Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
03/17/1994Became Public Law No: 103-220.
03/17/1994Signed by President.
03/08/1994SenatePresented to President.
03/02/1994-2:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/02/1994-2:59pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
03/02/1994-2:55pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H918-919)
03/02/1994-2:55pmHouseMr. Rahall asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
02/08/1994-3:54pmHouseHeld at the desk.
02/08/1994-2:04pmHouseReceived in the House.
02/08/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
02/07/1994SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S1091)
02/04/1994SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 361.
02/04/1994SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Baucus without amendment. Without written report.
01/27/1994SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/25/1994SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 01/25/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 01/25/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/04/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/04/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works01/25/1994 Referred to
01/27/1994 Markup by
02/04/1994 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1789. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/25/1994)

Amends Federal highway law to authorize States to carry out projects for seismic retrofit of bridges without regard to whether such bridges are eligible for replacement or rehabilitation under the highway bridge replacement and rehabilitation program.