Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/27/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/01/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/08/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/09/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 02/09/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/09/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/10/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/10/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/22/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/22/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 02/22/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/22/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/22/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/24/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/07/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/10/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/16/1994
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/16/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/23/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/23/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/23/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/24/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 04/12/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/12/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/13/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 04/14/1994
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/21/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 05/03/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/04/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/05/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 05/11/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 05/17/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/17/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/23/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/25/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 06/07/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/09/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/21/1994
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 06/21/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/30/1994