Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/02/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/15/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/21/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/21/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/11/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 06/07/1994