Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 01/28/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 01/28/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 02/02/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/02/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/02/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 02/02/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 02/02/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 02/02/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 02/02/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/02/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/02/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/04/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/16/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/16/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/16/1993
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/16/1993
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/17/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/17/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/17/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/24/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/25/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 02/25/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 02/25/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/02/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/02/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/02/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 03/02/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/02/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/10/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/18/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 04/20/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 04/22/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/29/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 07/01/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/13/1993