Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 02/23/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/23/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 02/25/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 02/25/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/25/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 02/25/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 02/25/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 03/02/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/02/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/08/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/08/1994
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/08/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/08/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/08/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/08/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/08/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/08/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/08/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/08/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/08/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/08/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/08/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/08/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/15/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/15/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 03/15/1994
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/15/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/15/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 03/15/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/15/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/16/1994