Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 01/28/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/16/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/18/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/18/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/24/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 06/24/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 06/24/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/30/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 06/09/1994