Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/03/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/03/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 03/03/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/03/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/03/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 03/03/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 03/03/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 05/18/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/18/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 05/18/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/18/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/14/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/14/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/01/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/15/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/22/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 07/22/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/22/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/26/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 07/28/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/28/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/28/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/28/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 07/28/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 07/28/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 08/01/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 08/01/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 08/01/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/08/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 08/08/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 08/08/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 08/17/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 08/17/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/17/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 08/17/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 08/25/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/13/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/13/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 09/13/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/13/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/19/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/22/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 10/06/1994