There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Board of Veterans' Appeals Administrative Procedures Improvement Act of 1994

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Board of Veterans' Appeals Administrative Procedures Improvement Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 38, United States Code, to improve the organization and procedures of the Board of Veterans' Appeals.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
07/01/1994Became Public Law No: 103-271.
07/01/1994Signed by President.
06/22/1994Presented to President.
06/15/1994Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S6968)
06/13/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
04/21/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S4757-4761)
04/14/1994Committee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Rockefeller with amendments. Without written report.
03/08/1994Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
07/01/1994Became Public Law No: 103-271.
07/01/1994Signed by President.
06/22/1994SenatePresented to President.
06/16/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/15/1994SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S6968)
06/14/1994SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
06/13/1994-12:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/13/1994-12:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
06/13/1994-12:18pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
06/13/1994-12:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4349-4354)
06/13/1994-12:18pmHouseMr. Montgomery moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/26/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
04/25/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
04/25/1994-12:34pmHouseHeld at the desk.
04/25/1994-12:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
04/21/1994SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S4757-4761)
04/14/1994SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413.
04/14/1994SenateCommittee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Rockefeller with amendments. Without written report.
04/14/1994SenateCommittee on Veterans. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
03/24/1994SenateCommittee on Veterans. Hearings held.
03/08/1994SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
03/08/1994SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2502-2504)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/08/1994 Referred to
03/24/1994 Hearings by
04/14/1994 Markup by
04/14/1994 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs04/26/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1904.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1904. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/13/1994)

Board of Veterans' Appeals Administrative Procedures Improvement Act of 1994 - Amends Federal law pertaining to the Board of Veterans' Appeals to: (1) remove the 65-person limitation for the Board; (2) subject the Chairman of the Board to the same limitations and restrictions concerning involvement in political activities as currently apply to judges of the U.S. Court of Veterans Appeals; (3) allow the Chairman to designate employees of the Department of Veterans Affairs to serve as acting members of the Board for up to 90 days (with other limitations); and (4) include information concerning such acting members and the number of cases they handled in a required report on Board activities.

Allows proceedings assigned to the Board to be assigned to an individual member or a three-member panel for decision. (Current law requires such decisions by a minimum three-member panel.) Sets forth revised provisions relating to: (1) decision reconsideration as ordered by the Chairman; (2) the correction of obvious errors upon Board motion; and (3) appeals procedures.

Allows (current law requires) the Secretary to require a parents' dependency and indemnity compensation recipient or applicant to file an annual income statement. Requires the applicant to notify the Secretary (current law requires a revised report) when there is a material change in the applicant's estimated income for that year. Makes identical changes with respect to a recipient or applicant for veterans' pension benefits.