Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/09/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD]* 03/09/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 03/09/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/09/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 03/09/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 03/09/1994
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 03/09/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 03/09/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/10/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/15/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/21/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 04/21/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/06/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 05/18/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/25/1994