Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 03/10/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 03/10/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/10/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 03/22/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/22/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/22/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 03/22/1994
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 03/22/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 03/22/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/22/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/25/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/13/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/13/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 04/19/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/02/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/10/1994