There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1994

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Veterans' Benefits Act of 1994

Short Titles as Passed House for portions of this bill
  • Veterans' Adjudication Improvements Act of 1994

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1994

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1994

Short Titles as Introduced

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1994

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase the rates of compensation for veterans with service-connected disabilities and the rates of dependency and indemnity compensation for the survivors of certain disabled veterans.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
10/25/1994Became Public Law No: 103-418.
10/25/1994Signed by President.
10/18/1994Presented to President.
10/07/1994Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment Agreed to without objection.(consideration: CR H11232)
10/06/1994Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate concurred in the House amendments with amendment (SP2638) by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S14438)
08/08/1994Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
08/08/1994Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
05/04/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S5204)
04/26/1994Committee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment. With written report No. 103-254.
03/11/1994Introduced in Senate

All Actions (29)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/25/1994Became Public Law No: 103-418.
10/25/1994Signed by President.
10/18/1994SenatePresented to President.
10/07/1994-1:01pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/07/1994-1:01pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment Agreed to without objection. (consideration: CR H11232)
10/07/1994-1:00pmHouseMr. Montgomery asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment to the House amendment.
10/06/1994SenateSenate concurred in the House amendments with amendment (SP2638) by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S14438)
10/06/1994SenateS.Amdt.2638 Amendment SP 2638 agreed to in Senate by Voice Vote.
10/06/1994SenateS.Amdt.2638 Proposed by Senator Ford for Senator Rockefeller. To propose a substitute.
10/06/1994SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent.
08/10/1994SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at the desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
08/08/1994-12:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
08/08/1994-12:33pmHouseA similar measure H.R. 4088 was laid on the table without objection.
08/08/1994-12:33pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended to that of similar measure H.R. 4088. Agreed to without objection.
08/08/1994-12:33pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
08/08/1994-12:33pmHouseThe House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 4088. Agreed to without objection.
08/08/1994-12:33pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7097)
08/08/1994HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
08/08/1994-12:32pmHouseMr. Montgomery asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
05/05/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/05/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/05/1994-11:26amHouseReceived in the House.
05/04/1994SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5204)
04/26/1994SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 418.
04/26/1994SenateCommittee on Veterans. Reported to Senate by Senator Rockefeller with an amendment. With written report No. 103-254.
04/14/1994SenateCommittee on Veterans. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
03/24/1994SenateCommittee on Veterans. Hearings held.
03/11/1994SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans.
03/11/1994SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2879)

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/11/1994 Referred to
03/24/1994 Hearings by
04/14/1994 Markup by
04/26/1994 Reported by
House Veterans' Affairs05/05/1994 Referred to
08/08/1994 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1927. View summaries

Shown Here:
Senate agreed to House amendment with amendment (10/06/1994)

Veterans' Compensation Cost-of-Living Adjustment Act of 1994 - Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs, as of December 1, 1994, to increase the rates of and limitations on: (1) veterans' disability compensation; (2) additional compensation for veterans' dependents; (3) the clothing allowance for certain disabled veterans; (4) dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children; and (5) supplemental dependency and indemnity compensation for disabled adult children. Requires such increases to be the same percentage as the increase in benefit amounts payable under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) (OASDI) of the Social Security Act.

Authorizes the Secretary to adjust administratively the rates of disability compensation payable to certain persons who are not in receipt of compensation for service-connected disability or death.

Requires the Secretary to publish such rate increases and limitations in the Federal Register at the same time that OASDI benefit increases are required to be published.