Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/22/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/22/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 03/25/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/12/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/12/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 04/21/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/26/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 05/18/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/07/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/20/1994
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/12/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/19/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/06/1994