There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

United States Botanic Garden Commemorative Coin Act of 1995

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Botanic Garden Commemorative Coin Act of 1995

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the minting of coins to commemorate the 175th anniversary of the founding of the United States Botanic Garden.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/24/1994Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Riegle with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/17/1994Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
05/24/1994Committee on Banking. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/24/1994Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 437.
Action By: Senate
05/24/1994Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator Riegle with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
03/17/1994Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
Action By: Senate
03/17/1994Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S3254)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/17/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 03/17/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/25/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 03/25/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/25/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 03/25/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/25/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 03/25/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 03/25/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 03/25/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/25/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 03/25/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 03/25/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/25/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/25/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/25/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 03/25/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 03/25/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/25/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/25/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 03/25/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/25/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/25/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/25/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/25/1994
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 03/25/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/25/1994
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/25/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/25/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/25/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/25/1994
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/25/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 03/25/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 03/25/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 03/25/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 03/25/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 03/25/1994
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 03/25/1994
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 03/25/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/25/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/25/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/25/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 03/25/1994
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/25/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 03/25/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 03/25/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 03/25/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 04/14/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/14/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 04/14/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 04/14/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 04/14/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 04/14/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 04/14/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 05/23/1994

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs03/17/1994 Referred to
05/24/1994 Markup by
05/24/1994 Reported by

No related bill information was received for S.1952.


Subjects (12)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1952. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (05/24/1994)

United States Botanic Garden Commemorative Coin Act of 1995 - Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to issue one-dollar silver coins for a one-year period to commemorate the 175th anniversary of the founding of the United States Botanic Garden.

States that the design for such coins shall be selected by the Secretary after consultation with the National Fund for the United States Botanic Garden and the Commission of Fine Arts and after review by the Citizens Commemorative Coin Advisory Committee.

Directs the Secretary to distribute all surcharges from the coin sales to the National Fund for the United States Botanic Garden.