Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 03/24/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/25/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 04/11/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/03/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/28/1994