Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 01/26/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 01/26/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 01/26/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 01/26/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 01/26/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 01/26/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 01/28/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 01/28/1993
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 01/28/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 01/28/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 01/28/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 02/03/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/03/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/03/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/04/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/04/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/04/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 02/17/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/17/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/17/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 03/10/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/10/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/10/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 03/10/1993
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 03/10/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 03/10/1993