Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 03/25/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/25/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO]* 03/25/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/11/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 04/20/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 04/20/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 04/26/1994
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 04/26/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 05/05/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/05/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/10/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 05/10/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 05/10/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/11/1994
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 05/11/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 05/12/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 05/12/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/12/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/16/1994