Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 01/21/1993
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/03/1993
Sen. Krueger, Robert C. [D-TX] 02/03/1993
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/03/1993
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 02/03/1993
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/16/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/02/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 03/02/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/09/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 04/22/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/05/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 05/05/1993
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 05/19/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 06/22/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/15/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/22/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/15/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 03/15/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 03/17/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/17/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 03/17/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 03/23/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/23/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/23/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/23/1994
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 04/11/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 04/11/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 04/12/1994