Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA]* 05/17/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 06/07/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 06/14/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 06/15/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/21/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 06/21/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 06/21/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 06/22/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 06/23/1994
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/27/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 06/27/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/30/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/30/1994
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 06/30/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 06/30/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/30/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/11/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/19/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 07/20/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/21/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/25/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 08/03/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 08/03/1994
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/26/1994