Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 01/26/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 02/25/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/16/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/29/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 03/29/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 03/29/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 03/29/1993
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 03/29/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 03/30/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/01/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/01/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 04/01/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/01/1993
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 04/01/1993
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 04/01/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 04/05/1993
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 04/05/1993
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 04/05/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/19/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 04/21/1993
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/21/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/21/1993
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/21/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 04/21/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 04/29/1993
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 04/29/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/04/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/04/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/04/1993
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 05/04/1993
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 05/04/1993
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 05/04/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/04/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 05/05/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/05/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 05/06/1993
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 05/11/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 05/11/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 05/24/1993