Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/10/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 06/15/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/21/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 06/27/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 06/30/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/27/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 07/28/1994
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 08/01/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/01/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/05/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 08/18/1994