Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 06/14/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/21/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 06/21/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 06/21/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 06/21/1994
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 06/22/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 06/22/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/22/1994
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 06/22/1994
Sen. Sasser, Jim [D-TN] 06/22/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 06/22/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/28/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/28/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 06/29/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 06/29/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/11/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/11/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/11/1994
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 07/11/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/11/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/11/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/11/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 07/11/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/19/1994
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 07/20/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/21/1994
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 07/21/1994
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/21/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/21/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 07/21/1994
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/21/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 07/21/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/21/1994
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/21/1994
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 07/21/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/21/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 07/21/1994
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/21/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 07/21/1994
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/21/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/21/1994
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 07/21/1994
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 07/21/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR] 07/21/1994
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 07/21/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 07/21/1994
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 07/21/1994
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY] 07/21/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/21/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/21/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 07/28/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/28/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 08/01/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 08/03/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 08/16/1994
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 08/19/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 08/23/1994
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 10/04/1994