Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 06/20/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 06/21/1994
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 07/19/1994
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/29/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 08/01/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/19/1994