There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide authorization of appropriations for the Federal Emergency Food and Shelter Program for the fiscal years 1995 and 1996.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
08/10/1994Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S11185)
08/05/1994Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Glenn without amendment. Without written report.
06/21/1994Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/30/1994HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development.
Action By: Committee on Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs
08/11/1994HouseReferred to the House Committee on Banking, Finance + Urban Affrs.
08/11/1994-11:25amHouseReceived in the House.
08/11/1994SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/10/1994SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S11185)
08/05/1994SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 544.
08/05/1994SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Glenn without amendment. Without written report.
08/02/1994SenateCommittee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/21/1994SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
06/21/1994SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7245-7246)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 06/21/1994

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Governmental Affairs06/21/1994 Referred to
08/02/1994 Markup by
08/05/1994 Reported by
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs08/11/1994 Referred to
House Banking, Finance, and Urban Affairs Subcommittee on Housing and Community Development08/30/1994 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2218.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2218. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/21/1994)

Amends the Stewart B. McKinney Homeless Assistance Act to authorize appropriations for the emergency food and shelter program.