Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 06/30/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 06/30/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 06/30/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN]* 06/30/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME]* 06/30/1994
Sen. Pryor, David H. [D-AR]* 06/30/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/30/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 06/30/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 06/30/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 07/01/1994
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 07/01/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/01/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 07/15/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/15/1994
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 08/17/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 08/17/1994
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/13/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 09/27/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/30/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/30/1994