Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 07/01/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 07/01/1994
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/01/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 07/01/1994
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI]* 07/01/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI]* 07/01/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 07/01/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI]* 07/01/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL]* 07/01/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 07/01/1994
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH]* 07/01/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/15/1994
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/20/1994
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/20/1994
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 09/29/1994