Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 07/14/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 07/14/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 07/14/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 07/20/1994
Sen. Riegle, Donald W., Jr. [D-MI] 07/20/1994
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 07/25/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 08/16/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/27/1994