Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 07/27/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ]* 07/27/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME]* 07/27/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 07/27/1994
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/27/1994
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/27/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO]* 07/27/1994
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 07/27/1994
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY]* 07/27/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 07/27/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 07/27/1994
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 08/03/1994
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 08/03/1994
Sen. Wofford, Harris [D-PA] 08/03/1994
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 08/03/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/03/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 08/03/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 08/03/1994
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/03/1994
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 08/09/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 08/09/1994
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 08/09/1994
Sen. Dole, Robert J. [R-KS] 08/09/1994
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 08/09/1994
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 08/12/1994
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 08/12/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 08/15/1994
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 08/15/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 08/17/1994
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 08/18/1994
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 08/25/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 09/19/1994
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/19/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/26/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/26/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 09/26/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/28/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/04/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/05/1994