Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 08/01/1994
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 08/01/1994
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 08/12/1994
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 08/15/1994
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 08/16/1994
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 08/18/1994
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 08/22/1994
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 08/24/1994
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 08/25/1994
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [D-CO] 09/14/1994
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/14/1994
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 09/14/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 09/14/1994
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 09/14/1994
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/14/1994
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 09/20/1994
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 09/21/1994
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/21/1994
Sen. Mitchell, George J. [D-ME] 09/23/1994
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/23/1994
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/23/1994