Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 02/02/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 02/02/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 02/03/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/04/1993
Sen. Brown, Hank [R-CO] 02/16/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/16/1993
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [D-AL] 02/16/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/18/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 02/24/1993
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 02/24/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/02/1993
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 05/13/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 10/19/1993

Show cosponsors who withdrew