Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN]* 09/26/1994
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/29/1994
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/03/1994
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 10/03/1994
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/05/1994
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 10/05/1994
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/05/1994
Sen. DeConcini, Dennis [D-AZ] 10/05/1994
Sen. Danforth, John C. [R-MO] 10/05/1994
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL] 10/05/1994
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 10/05/1994
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 10/05/1994
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 10/05/1994
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/05/1994
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 10/05/1994
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 10/05/1994
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 10/05/1994
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 10/05/1994
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 10/06/1994
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 10/06/1994