There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Mineral Exploration and Development Act of 1993

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to modify the requirements applicable to locatable minerals on public domain lands, consistent with the principles of self-initiation of mining claims, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/28/1993Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
03/16/1993Subcommittee on Mineral Resources Development. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 103-149.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Mineral Resources Development and Production
01/29/1993Referred to Subcommittee on Mineral Resources Development.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
01/28/1993Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate
01/28/1993Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S898-902)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/28/1993 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Mineral Resources Development and Production01/29/1993 Referred to
03/16/1993 Hearings by

No related bill information was received for S.257.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.257. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/28/1993)

TABLE OF CONTENTS:

Title I: Mineral Exploration and Development

Title II: Environmental Considerations of Mineral Exploration

and Development

Title III: Abandoned Minerals Mine Reclamation Fund

Title IV: Administrative and Miscellaneous Provisions

Mineral Exploration and Development Act of 1993 - Title I: Mineral Exploration and Development - (Sec. 102) Sets forth guidelines for mineral exploration on public domain lands. Declares that holders of mining claims executed under this Act have the exclusive right of possession and use of the claimed land for mineral activities.

(Sec. 103) Prescribes rules for mining claim location and use of public land surveys. Provides for administrative adjudication of conflicting claims.

(Sec. 104) Sets forth: (1) an annual, graduated rental fee schedule based upon the number of diligence years following location of the claim; and (2) a forfeiture procedure for failure to pay.

(Sec. 105) Establishes a civil penalty of $5,000 per violation of mining claim fraud.

(Sec. 107) Prohibits the issuance after January 28, 1993, of patents for mining claims unless certain administrative requirements are met.

(Sec. 108) Declares that the Multiple Minerals Development Act, and certain provisions of the Act of July 23, 1955, apply to all mining claims located or converted under this Act.

(Sec. 109) Amends Federal law to subject all mineral materials deposits to disposal under the terms of the Materials Act of 1947 (eliminating the concept of uncommon varieties). Renames specified Federal laws: (1) the Surface Resources Act of 1955; and (2) the Materials Act of 1947. Repeals the Building Stone Act and the Saline Placer Act.

Title II: Environmental Considerations of Mineral Exploration and Development - (Sec. 201) Prescribes surface management guidelines for mineral activities and reclamation, including a mandatory plan of operations. Mandates that lands subject to mineral activities be restored to a condition capable of supporting their prior uses. Requires the Secretary to establish reclamation standards.

(Sec. 202) Requires the Secretary to inspect mineral activities to ensure compliance with statutory directives. Sets forth enforcement guidelines and civil penalties for non-compliance. Authorizes citizen suits to enforce compliance.

(Sec. 203) Declares that State standards for reclamation, bonding, inspection, water or air quality, which either meet or exceed Federal standards, shall not be construed as inconsistent with this Act. Permits cooperative agreements between the States and the Secretary. Prohibits the Secretary from delegating authorities or responsibilities conferred under this Act to any State or its political subdivision.

(Sec. 204) Requires the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture, in preparing land use plans, to determine those areas deemed unsuitable for certain mineral activities. Requires withdrawal of such areas from mineral exploration and development. Grants any person with an interest that may be adversely affected by potential mineral activities the right to petition the Secretary for a suitability review.

(Sec. 205) Identifies categories of lands which are not open to the location of mining claims under this Act (including wilderness, wild and scenic river, and related lands).

Title III: Abandoned Minerals Mine Reclamation Fund - (Secs. 301 and 302) Establishes the Abandoned Minerals Mine Reclamation Fund for the reclamation and restoration of land and water resources adversely affected by past minerals activities.

(Secs. 303-306) Sets forth: (1) State eligibility requirements; and (2) Fund allocation and expenditure guidelines for grant distribution among eligible States. Authorizes appropriations.

Title IV: Administrative and Miscellaneous Provisions - (Sec. 401) Amends the Mining and Minerals Policy Act of 1970 and the National Materials and Minerals Policy Research and Development Act of 1980 to direct the Secretary of Agriculture to implement specified minerals policy and actions to improve availability and analysis of mineral data in Federal land use decision making for National Forest System lands.

(Sec. 402) Authorizes the Secretaries of the Interior and of Agriculture to establish user fees to reimburse the United States for expenses incurred in administering this Act.

(Sec. 404) Sets forth guidelines for a three-year transitional period during which the holder of an unpatented mining or mill site claim may elect to convert it or risk its forfeiture.

(Sec. 406) Prescribes guidelines under which a mining claim may be challenged.

(Sec. 410) Sets a minimum royalty amount of eight percent of the gross income from the production of locatable minerals from any mining claim located under this Act, payable to the United States.