Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 02/02/1993
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/16/1993
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/16/1993
Sen. Metzenbaum, Howard M. [D-OH] 02/16/1993
Sen. Bradley, Bill [D-NJ] 02/16/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 02/17/1993
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 02/18/1993
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/24/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/24/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/02/1993
Sen. Pell, Claiborne [D-RI] 03/09/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/19/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 03/23/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/23/1993
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/20/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 04/21/1993
Sen. Simon, Paul [D-IL] 05/05/1993
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 06/07/1993
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 08/02/1993
Sen. Cohen, William S. [R-ME] 10/25/1993