Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Wallop, Malcolm [R-WY]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 01/28/1993
Sen. Heflin, Howell [D-AL]* 01/28/1993
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 02/24/1993
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/24/1993
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/24/1993
Sen. Mathews, Harlan [D-TN] 02/24/1993
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/24/1993
Sen. Pressler, Larry [R-SD] 02/24/1993
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 02/24/1993
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 02/24/1993
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/02/1993
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 03/09/1993
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/10/1993
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/10/1993
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/10/1993
Sen. Hatfield, Mark O. [R-OR] 03/11/1993
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/18/1993
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 03/25/1993
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/30/1993
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 03/30/1993
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/30/1993
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/30/1993
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/30/1993
Sen. Boren, David L. [D-OK] 04/27/1993
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/27/1993
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/27/1993
Sen. Johnston, J. Bennett [D-LA] 04/27/1993
Sen. Nunn, Sam [D-GA] 04/27/1993
Sen. Simpson, Alan K. [R-WY] 04/27/1993
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 04/27/1993
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/20/1993
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/20/1993
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/25/1993
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 05/25/1993
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 05/25/1993
Sen. Kassebaum, Nancy Landon [R-KS] 05/25/1993
Sen. Durenberger, Dave [R-MN] 06/07/1993
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/07/1993
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 06/07/1993
Sen. Packwood, Bob [R-OR] 06/22/1993
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/30/1993
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 06/30/1993
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 06/30/1993
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/01/1993
Sen. Exon, J. James [D-NE] 07/01/1993
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/20/1993
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 08/06/1993
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 09/29/1993
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 11/10/1993